ME LD134 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Increase the Handling Fee for Beverage Containers Reimbursed to Dealers and Redemption Centers
Title
An Act to Increase the Handling Fee for Beverage Containers Reimbursed to Dealers and Redemption Centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2023-04-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-04-27 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2023-04-27 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-34). |
2023-04-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-04-27 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-34) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-34) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-04-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2023-04-18 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-04-06 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-04-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-01-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |