ME LD1338 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Maine Consumer Credit Code To Conform with Federal Law
Title
An Act To Amend the Maine Consumer Credit Code To Conform with Federal Law
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Beck [D] | Rep. Adam Goode [D] | Rep. Terry Morrison [D] | Rep. Wesley Richardson [R] |
Sen. Rodney Whittemore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-06-16 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator PLOWMAN of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2011-06-16 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-16 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-06-15 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-15 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-311) | |
2011-06-15 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-06-15 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2011-06-15 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-06-15 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-311) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-06-15 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (S-311) READ and ADOPTED | |
2011-03-29 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-03-29 | (S) On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES | |
2011-03-29 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |