ME LD1335 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Youth Mental Health First Aid Training to Secondary School Health Educators
Title
An Act To Provide Youth Mental Health First Aid Training to Secondary School Health Educators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-421) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-471) thereto in concurrence |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-421) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-471) thereto ADOPTED |
2017-06-13 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-471) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-421) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-421) READ |
2017-06-13 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-421) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-471) thereto. |
2017-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-421) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-471) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2017-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative McCREIGHT of Harpswell, House Amendment "A" (H-471) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-421) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-421) was READ. |
2017-06-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-12 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-12 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending the motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-06-07 | House | Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-04-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-06 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |