ME LD1329 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Allow Tobacco Retail Establishments To Serve Alcohol

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Allow Tobacco Retail Establishments To Serve Alcohol

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #521 (Y: 5 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #494 (Y: 93 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2018-03-01SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
2018-03-01SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 521 Yeas 5 - Nays 28 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
2018-03-01SenateMotion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to accept the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED.
2018-03-01SenateReports Read
2018-02-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-02-27HouseROLL CALL NO. 494 (Yeas 93 - Nays 46 - Absent 12 - Excused 0)
2018-02-27HouseOn motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-02-27HouseReports READ.
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-04-18SenateOn motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
2017-04-13HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-13HouseThe House INSISTED on REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2017-04-11SenateSent down for concurrence
2017-04-11SenateOn motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-04-11SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-04-06SenateUnfinished Business
2017-04-06SenateOn motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
2017-04-04HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-04HouseCommittee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback