ME LD1323 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Revise the Laws Regarding the Public Trust in Intertidal Lands

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Revise the Laws Regarding the Public Trust in Intertidal Lands

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - House - Recede And Concur RC #231 (Y: 74 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Insist RC #254 (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #216 (Y: 72 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #225 (Y: 7 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2019-06-12HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-12HouseROLL CALL NO. 231 (Yeas 74 - Nays 72 - Absent 4 - Excused 1)
2019-06-12HouseOn motion of Representative STEWART of Presque Isle, The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2019-06-11SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-11SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 254 Yeas 26 - Nays 8 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-06-11SenateMotion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report
2019-06-10HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-10HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2019-06-10HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-222).
2019-06-10HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-10HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-222) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-10HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-10HouseROLL CALL NO. 216 (Yeas 72 - Nays 70 - Absent 6 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-10HouseOn motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-10HouseReports READ.
2019-06-07SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-07SenateSubsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
2019-06-07SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 225 Yeas 7 - Nays 25 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
2019-06-07SenateMotion by Senator DILL of Penobscot to Accept the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED
2019-06-07SenateReports Read
2019-03-19HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-19HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
2019-03-19SenateCommittee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback