ME LD1320 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Improve Signature Requirements for Candidates by Allowing Unenrolled Voters to Sign Petitions for Party Candidates
Title
An Act to Improve Signature Requirements for Candidates by Allowing Unenrolled Voters to Sign Petitions for Party Candidates
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Rep. Benjamin Hymes [R] |
Rep. Walter Riseman [I] | Rep. Laura Supica [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #161 (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-05-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-25 | House | On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 161 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-05-19 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-05 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |