ME LD1320 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Regulate Fantasy Sports Contests

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Regulate Fantasy Sports Contests

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - Recede And Concur RC #417 (Y: 90 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #414 (Y: 53 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2017-07-20SenateOn Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2017-06-30SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
2017-06-29HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-29HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-29HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-29HouseROLL CALL NO. 417 (Yeas 90 - Nays 53 - Absent 7 - Excused 1)
2017-06-29HouseOn motion of Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford, the House RECEDED AND CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-314).
2017-06-29SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-29SenateOn motion by Senator COLLINS of York The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-314)
2017-06-28HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-28HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2017-06-28HouseOn further motion of same Representative the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-28HouseROLL CALL NO. 414 (Yeas 53 - Nays 81 - Absent 16 - Excused 1)
2017-06-28HouseMotion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED.
2017-06-28HouseReports READ.
2017-06-28SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-28SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-314)
2017-06-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-314) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-28SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-28SenateOn motion by Senator COLLINS of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2017-06-28SenateReports READ
2017-04-04HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-04HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2017-04-04SenateCommittee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback