ME LD1318 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Align State Relocation Assistance with That of the Federal Government and Make Technical Changes to Recently Enacted Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Align State Relocation Assistance with That of the Federal Government and Make Technical Changes to Recently Enacted Laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-07-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-07-20HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-112) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-319).
2017-07-20SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-07-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-112) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-319) In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-07-20SenateOn motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-319) READ and ADOPTED
2017-07-20SenateSubsequently On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
2017-07-20SenateOn motion by Senator COLLINS of York TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE
2017-05-17SenateOn motion by Senator COLLINS of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending ENACTMENT
2017-05-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-16HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-05-11SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2017-05-11SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-112), in concurrence.
2017-05-11SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2017-05-09SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2017-05-09SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-112) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2017-05-09SenateREAD ONCE
2017-05-09SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED
2017-05-04HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-04HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-112).
2017-05-04HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-05-04HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-04-04SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence
2017-04-04HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-04HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
2017-04-04HouseCommittee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback