ME LD1315 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Support Medically Monitored Crisis Support and Intervention
Title
An Act To Support Medically Monitored Crisis Support and Intervention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs in concurrence |
2020-01-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-30 | House | Subsequently, On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2020-01-30 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2020-01-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2020-01-14 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending the motion to SUSPEND THE RULES. |
2020-01-14 | House | Representative GATTINE of Westbrook MOVED that the RULES BE SUSPENDED for the purpose of reconsideration. |
2020-01-14 | House | Bill RECALLED From Governor (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1416) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-351), in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-351) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-351). |
2019-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |