ME LD1313 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 185 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 185 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enact the Maine Death with Dignity Act
Title
An Act To Enact the Maine Death with Dignity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Rep. Dale Denno [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] |
Rep. Michele Meyer [D] | Sen. Marianne Moore [R] | Rep. Paul Stearns [R] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Enactment RC #185 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - Enactment RC #173 (Y: 73 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #165 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #142 (Y: 72 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - Enactment RC #173 (Y: 73 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #165 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #142 (Y: 72 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 185 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 173 (Yeas 73 - Nays 72 - Absent 3 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin moved Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-305) in concurrence |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING LATER IN TODAY'S SESSION. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin Objected to Suspension of the Rules to give Bill A SECOND READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-305) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 165 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-305). |
2019-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-305) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 142 (Yeas 72 - Nays 68 - Absent 8 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-28 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-21 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-05-21 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-05-21 | House | Representative HYMANSON of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |