ME LD1313 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend Licensing Requirements for Professional Engineers
Title
An Act To Amend Licensing Requirements for Professional Engineers
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Rep. Henry Beck [D] | Sen. Patrick Flood [R] | Sen. Colleen Lachowicz [D] |
Rep. Lori Fowle [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Rep. Thomas Longstaff [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-06-13 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-13 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-02 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed |