ME LD1310 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 9 Yeas - 26 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 9 Yeas - 26 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Access to Dental Care through Empowering the Denturist Subcommittee of the Board of Dental Examiners
Title
An Act To Improve Access to Dental Care through Empowering the Denturist Subcommittee of the Board of Dental Examiners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #662 (Y: 9 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Enactment RC #605 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #733 (Y: 90 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #599 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Enactment RC #605 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #733 (Y: 90 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #599 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | 9 Yeas - 26 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Roll Call # 662 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | LD 1310 In Senate, May 1, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 9 in the Affirmative and 26 in the Negative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2014-04-17 | Senate | 33 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 605 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-418). |
2014-04-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-418) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 733 (Yeas 90 - Nays 54 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-17 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-418) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-418) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-04-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-04-17 | Senate | 18 Yeas - 17 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 599 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Subsequently, On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2014-04-17 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-24 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reports READ |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order . |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-04-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-02 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed |