ME LD1306 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create a Small Communities Tourism Grant Program
Title
An Act To Create a Small Communities Tourism Grant Program
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Herbig [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Richard Cebra [R] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] |
Rep. Norman Higgins [I] | Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D] | Rep. Joel Stetkis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #347 (Y: 85 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #190 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #158 (Y: 81 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #190 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #158 (Y: 81 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.) |
2017-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 347V 85 having voted in the affirmative and 63 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and 0 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained. |
2017-06-19 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston the Bill was TABLED pending RECONSIDERATION. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-227) in concurrence |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-227) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 190 Yeas 16 - Nays 19 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-227). |
2017-05-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-227) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-24 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 158 (Yeas 81 - Nays 63 - Absent 5 - Excused 2) |
2017-05-24 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |