ME LD1305 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Encourage Savings through Contributions to Family Development Accounts
Title
An Act To Encourage Savings through Contributions to Family Development Accounts
Sponsors
Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] | Rep. Robert Alley [D] | Rep. Lydia Blume [D] | Rep. Heidi Brooks [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Rep. Allison Hepler [D] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Acc Report 'b' Ontp RC #130 (Y: 74 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Ontp RC #128 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Ontp RC #128 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Report B Ought Not To Pass ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-05-28 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 130 (Yeas 74 - Nays 66 - Absent 8 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-28 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, REPORT B Ought Not to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-137) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-137) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Subsequently Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 128 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland To ACCEPT Report B Ought Not To Pass FAILED |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-03-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |