ME LD1302 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Maine Metallic Mineral Mining Act To Protect Water Quality
Title
An Act To Amend the Maine Metallic Mineral Mining Act To Protect Water Quality
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #311 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-18 - House - Insist RC #362 (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #162 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-05 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #206 (Y: 91 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - House - Insist RC #362 (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #162 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-05 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #206 (Y: 91 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2013-06-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 362 (Yeas 97 - Nays 40 - Absent 14 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-18 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-304). |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (H-305) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-307) thereto, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (H-305) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-307) thereto ADOPTED. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, Senate Amendment "A" (S-307) to Committee Amendment "B" (H-305) READ and ADOPTED. (Remarks Made) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, the Senate RECEDED from ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "B" (H-305). |
2013-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook, the Senate RECEDED from Passage to be Engrossed as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-305). |
2013-06-18 | Senate | FAILED |
2013-06-18 | Senate | (16 -Yeas, 19 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Number 311 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Motion by GOODALL of Sagadahoc Senator to RECEDE and CONCUR to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-304) Report and Passage to be Engrossed as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-304) FAILED. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-14 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-10 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2013-06-07 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-07 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-304). |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (H-305), in NON-CONCURRENCE.. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (H-305) READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Subsequently, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-305) Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | FAILED |
2013-06-06 | Senate | (17 -Yeas, 18 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Roll Call Number 162 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Senator BOYLE of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-304), in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-304). |
2013-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-304) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 206 (Yeas 91 - Nays 49 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-05 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-05 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-04 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-04 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-04 | House | Representative WELSH of Rockport moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-04 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator Boyle of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Environment and Natural Resources, in concurrence. |
2013-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |