ME LD1301 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Improve the Safety of Vulnerable Users in Traffic and To Clarify the Responsibilities of Bicyclists and Pedestrians

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Improve the Safety of Vulnerable Users in Traffic and To Clarify the Responsibilities of Bicyclists and Pedestrians

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-09SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2015-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-06-08HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2015-06-04HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-06-04HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-177).
2015-06-04HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2015-06-04HouseUnder suspension of the rules
2015-06-04HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2015-06-04SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2015-06-04SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-177) .
2015-06-04SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-177) READ and ADOPTED.
2015-06-04SenateREAD ONCE.
2015-06-04SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2015-04-09HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-04-09HouseBill REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
2015-04-09SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2015-04-09SenateOn motion by Senator Collins of York REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION
2015-04-09Senatesuggested and ordered printed
2015-04-09SenateCommittee on TRANSPORTATION

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback