ME LD13 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Coordinate the Delivery of Individuals Committed to the Department of Corrections
Title
An Act To Coordinate the Delivery of Individuals Committed to the Department of Corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-04-09 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-29 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-03-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-17 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 11, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=13&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0020&item=1&snum=130 |