ME LD13 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 316: Long-Term Contracting and Resource Adequacy, a Major Substantive Rule of the Public Utilities Commission
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 316: Long-Term Contracting and Resource Adequacy, a Major Substantive Rule of the Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-6) in concurrence | |
2011-03-16 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Strimling, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2011-03-15 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-6) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-6) | |
2011-03-10 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-01-06 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence On motion by Senator Thibodeau of Waldo REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218 in concurrence | |
2011-01-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-01-05 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. | |
2011-01-05 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2011-01-05 | (H) Representative FITTS for the Public Utilities Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |