ME LD1290 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Statement of Purpose of the Maine Emergency Medical Services Act of 1982 To Include Emergency Responses That Do Not Require Transportation
Title
An Act To Amend the Statement of Purpose of the Maine Emergency Medical Services Act of 1982 To Include Emergency Responses That Do Not Require Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-19 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |