ME LD1274 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enact the Health Insurance Consumer Assistance Program
Title
An Act To Enact the Health Insurance Consumer Assistance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-110) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-338) thereto. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-110) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-338) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-110) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-338) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-338) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-110) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-110) was ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-110) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-110). |
2019-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-110). |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-110) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |