ME LD1272 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Increase Access to Low-cost Prescription Drugs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Increase Access to Low-cost Prescription Drugs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - House - Enactment RC #243 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #263 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2019-06-18SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-06-12SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-12HouseROLL CALL NO. 243 (Yeas 138 - Nays 3 - Absent 9 - Excused 1)
2019-06-12HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-12HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-12HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-250).
2019-06-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-12HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-250) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-12HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-12HouseOn motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-12HouseReports READ.
2019-06-11SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-11SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-250)
2019-06-11SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-250) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-11SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-11SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 263 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-11SenateOn motion by Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-06-11SenateReports Read
2019-03-14HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
2019-03-14SenateCommittee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback