ME LD1271 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - 23 Yeas - 12 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - 23 Yeas - 12 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Penalties for Campaign Finance Reporting Violations and Late Filing by Political Action Committees and Ballot Question Committees
Title
An Act Regarding Penalties for Campaign Finance Reporting Violations and Late Filing by Political Action Committees and Ballot Question Committees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #348 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-26 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #403 (Y: 104 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #403 (Y: 104 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | 23 Yeas - 12 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Roll Call # 348 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2013-06-26 | Senate | ____________________ |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enacted In Senate, June 11, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 23 in the Affermative and 12 in the Negative, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2013-06-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 403V 104 having voted in the affirmative and 43 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2013-06-26 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-340), in concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-340) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-340) |
2013-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Tuttle of York, REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2013-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-03-28 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |