ME LD1271 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Use of the Electronic Death Registration System
Title
An Act To Require Use of the Electronic Death Registration System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-06-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-15 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-06-14 | (S) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-621) thereto | |
2011-06-14 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-157) | |
2011-06-14 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-157) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-621) thereto | |
2011-06-14 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-157) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-621) thereto ADOPTED. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-621) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-157) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-157). | |
2011-06-14 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-157). | |
2011-06-14 | (H) On motion of Representative STRANG BURGESS of Cumberland, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) Bill RECALLED From Governor (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1175) | |
2011-05-31 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-31 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-31 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-26 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-26 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-157) | |
2011-05-26 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2011-05-26 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-05-26 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-157) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-05-26 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-25 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2011-05-25 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (S-157) READ and ADOPTED | |
2011-03-23 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-03-23 | (S) On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES | |
2011-03-23 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |