ME LD1267 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Protect Licensing Information of Medical Professionals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Protect Licensing Information of Medical Professionals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #626 (Y: 85 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #639 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2018-04-18HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-18HouseROLL CALL NO. 626V 85 having voted in the affirmative and 63 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
2018-04-18HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2018-04-18HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2018-04-18HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-18HouseROLL CALL NO. 626V 85 having voted in the affirmative and 63 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
2018-04-18HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2018-04-17SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-04-17SenateLD 1267 In Senate, April 17, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2018-04-04SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-04-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-03HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-04-02HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-02HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-424).
2018-04-02HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2018-04-02HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2018-03-29SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2018-03-29SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-424).
2018-03-29SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-424) READ and ADOPTED.
2018-03-29SenateREAD ONCE.
2018-03-29SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-03-30HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-30HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2017-03-30SenateCommittee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback