ME LD1260 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Create a Plan To Enhance the Efficiency and Effectiveness of the Probate Court System

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Create a Plan To Enhance the Efficiency and Effectiveness of the Probate Court System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #464 (Y: 77 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2017-08-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #424 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-08-02HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2017-08-02HouseROLL CALL NO. 464V 77 having voted in the affirmative and 57 in the negative, with 16 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Resolve not become a law and the veto was sustained.
2017-08-02HouseThis Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Resolve become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2017-08-02SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-08-02SenateLD 1260 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 31 IN FAVOR and 3 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2017-07-20SenateSubsequently FINALLY PASSED
2017-07-20SenateOn motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE
2017-06-21SenateOn motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE in concurrence
2017-06-21HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-21HouseSubsequently, FINALLY PASSED.
2017-06-21HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2017-06-21HouseLater today assigned.
2017-06-21HouseOn motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
2017-06-20HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-20HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-231) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-287) thereto.
2017-06-19SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-19SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-231) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-287) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-06-19SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-231) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-287) ADOPTED
2017-06-19SenateSubsequently On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-287) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-231) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-19SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-231) was ADOPTED
2017-06-19SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED whereby The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-231)
2017-06-19SenateOn motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec Under suspension of the Rules, The Senate RECONSIDERED FINAL PASSAGE
2017-06-19SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-06-16SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-15SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-15SenateOn motion by Senator COLLINS of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
2017-06-14SenateHELD at the Request of Senator COLLINS of York.
2017-06-14SenateFINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-06-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-13HouseFAILED FINAL PASSAGE.
2017-06-13HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2017-06-12HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-12HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-231).
2017-06-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-06-12HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-06-12SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-231)
2017-06-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-231) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-12SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-12SenateSubsequently Report ACCEPTED
2017-06-12SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-06-09SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-09SenateOn motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Report
2017-06-09SenateReport READ
2017-03-30HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-30HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2017-03-30SenateCommittee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback