ME LD1260 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Transparency in Maine Government
Title
An Act To Improve Transparency in Maine Government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | |
2011-06-03 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 106 (Yeas 76 - Nays 68 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-06-03 | (H) On motion of Representative BEAULIEU of Auburn, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-06-02 | (S) 20 Yeas - 13 Nays- 2 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2011-06-02 | (S) Sent down forthwith for concurrence On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 146 | |
2011-06-02 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator FARNHAM of Penobscot Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED | |
2011-03-29 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-03-22 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York Tabled Later Today Assigned pending REFERENCE Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-22 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1260&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0381&item=1&snum=125 |