ME LD126 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-12 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-12 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Restrict Swim Areas
Title
An Act To Restrict Swim Areas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2015-02-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-12 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONING the Bill and accompanying papers. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-02-03 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-01-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator EDGECOMB of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE , in concurrence. |
2015-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-22 | House | On motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=126&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0084&item=1&snum=127 |