ME LD126 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Amend Certain Laws Affecting Transportation
Title
An Act To Amend Certain Laws Affecting Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-04 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-04 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-06-02 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-477) in concurrence | |
2009-06-02 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-477) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-02 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-06-02 | (S) On motion by Senator DAMON of Hancock Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-477) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-02 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Reports READ | |
2009-06-01 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-477). | |
2009-06-01 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-477) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) On motion of Representative MAZUREK of Rockland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-01-15 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Damon of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-01-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-01-15 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | |
2009-01-15 | (H) Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |