ME LD1258 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Modernize the Voluntary Response Action Program Funding Process
Title
An Act To Modernize the Voluntary Response Action Program Funding Process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-76). |
2017-05-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) |
2017-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-03-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-03-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed |