ME LD1250 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Revise Maine's Unemployment Compensation Laws
Title
An Act To Revise Maine's Unemployment Compensation Laws
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Beaulieu [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Rep. Michael Carey [D] | Rep. Lance Harvell [R] |
Rep. Gary Knight [R] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Rep. Windol Weaver [R] | Rep. Ellen Winchenbach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-160), in concurrence. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-160) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-160). |
2013-05-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |