ME LD1243 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make the Law Regarding Critical Incident Stress Management Teams More Beneficial and Effective
Title
An Act To Make the Law Regarding Critical Incident Stress Management Teams More Beneficial and Effective
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-05-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-05-13 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-05-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-05-13 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-07 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
2015-04-07 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |