ME LD1243 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Amend Operating After Suspension Laws by Creating an Infraction Alternative for Certain Kinds of Operating After Suspension
Title
An Act To Amend Operating After Suspension Laws by Creating an Infraction Alternative for Certain Kinds of Operating After Suspension
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-05-29 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-412) in concurrence | |
2009-05-29 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2009-05-29 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-412) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-412) | |
2009-05-28 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-03-31 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Gerzofsky of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |