ME LD124 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify the Law Concerning the Priority of Appointment of Personal Representatives under the Maine Uniform Probate Code
Title
An Act To Clarify the Law Concerning the Priority of Appointment of Personal Representatives under the Maine Uniform Probate Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-03-29 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-02-25 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-02-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 19, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=124&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0056&item=1&snum=130 |