ME LD1237 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Insurance Coverage for Contraceptive Supplies
Title
An Act To Require Insurance Coverage for Contraceptive Supplies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #163 (Y: 10 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-179) in concurrence |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-179) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-24 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 163 Yeas 10 - Nays 25 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-179). |
2017-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-23 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-179) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-23 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-23 | House | On motion of Representative LAWRENCE of South Berwick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-23 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-05-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-17 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-17 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-05-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |