ME LD1232 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Require the Secretary of State To Automatically Register Nonregistered Persons Who Are Qualified To Vote through Records of the Bureau of Motor Vehicles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Require the Secretary of State To Automatically Register Nonregistered Persons Who Are Qualified To Vote through Records of the Bureau of Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #189 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #164 (Y: 74 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2017-06-01SenateOn motion by Senator COLLINS of York The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-05-31HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-31HouseThe House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-267).
2017-05-30SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-05-30SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 189 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2017-05-30SenateOn motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-05-30SenateReports Read
2017-05-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-25HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-267).
2017-05-25HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-05-25HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-267) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-05-25HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-05-25HouseROLL CALL NO. 164 (Yeas 74 - Nays 68 - Absent 7 - Excused 2)
2017-05-25HouseOn motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-05-25HouseReports READ.
2017-03-30SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2017-03-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-30HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2017-03-30HouseCommittee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback