ME LD123 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Recodify and Revise the Maine Probate Code

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Recodify and Revise the Maine Probate Code

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-04-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-17HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-04-17SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2018-04-17SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-762), in concurrence.
2018-04-17SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-762) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2018-04-17SenateREAD ONCE.
2018-04-17SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2018-04-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-13HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-762).
2018-04-13HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2018-04-13HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-01-19SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2017-01-19SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2017-01-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-17HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY
2017-01-17HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-01-17HouseRepresentative MOONEN for the Joint Standing Committee on Judiciary pursuant to Resolve 2015, chapter 73, section 1 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback