ME LD123 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Assist Seasonal Entertainment Facilities with Public Safety Requirements
Title
An Act To Assist Seasonal Entertainment Facilities with Public Safety Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 112 (Yeas 72 - Nays 65 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-06-03 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-06-02 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-02 | (H) Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2011-06-02 | (H) On motion of Representative PLUMMER of Windham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-06-01 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-01 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 94 (Yeas 74 - Nays 69 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-06-01 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-163). | |
2011-05-26 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-163) In NON-CONCURRENCE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-05-26 | (S) 19 Yeas - 16 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED (Remarks Made) | |
2011-05-26 | (S) on motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln Senate Amendment "A" (S-163) adopted On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 125 | |
2011-05-26 | (S) Taken from the table by the President Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln the senate RECONSIDERED its actions whereby it FAILED to ADOPT Senate Amendment "A" (S-163) On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 123 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED | |
2011-05-25 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York Tabled Later Today Assigned pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-25 | (S) under unanimous consent Senator Whittemore of Somerset presented for Senator MASON of Androscoggin Senate amendment "a" read Senate Amendment "A" (S-163) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 112 17 Yeas - 18 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent FAILED | |
2011-05-25 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Tabled Later Today Assigned pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2011-05-25 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-24 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 101 18 Yeas - 17 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2011-05-24 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-05-24 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Reports READ (Remarks Made) On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED in non-concurrence | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Subsequently, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-23 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 73 (Yeas 67 - Nays 75 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass Report FAILED. | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-31 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) On further motion of same Representative, TABLED pending the motion of Representative PLUMMER of Windham to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) On motion of Representative HASKELL of Portland the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) On motion of Representative PLUMMER of Windham, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) On motion by Senator Mason of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |