ME LD1225 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Motor Vehicle Inspection Program Requirements for New Rental Vehicles First Registered in Maine
Title
An Act Regarding the Motor Vehicle Inspection Program Requirements for New Rental Vehicles First Registered in Maine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-05-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-25 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-25 | House | Representative GRANT of Gardiner moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-03-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1225&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0416&item=1&snum=128 |