ME LD1213 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Taxpayers in the Privatization of State Services
Title
An Act To Protect Taxpayers in the Privatization of State Services
Sponsors
Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Lydia Blume [D] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Sen. Susan Deschambault [D] |
Sen. Lisa Keim [R] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Roland Martin [D] |
Rep. John Martin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #345 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-22 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-22 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-289). |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report |
2017-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-21 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-06-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-289). |
2017-06-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-289) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-21 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-21 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 345 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |