ME LD1213 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reduce Costs and Increase Access to Methadone Treatment
Title
An Act To Reduce Costs and Increase Access to Methadone Treatment
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Lockman [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Rep. Katherine Cassidy [D] |
Rep. Aaron Frey [D] | Rep. Adam Goode [D] | Rep. Victoria Kornfield [D] | Rep. John Schneck [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #485 (Y: 113 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2014-02-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2014-02-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 485 (Yeas 113 - Nays 29 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2014-02-11 | House | Subsequently, On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-02-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-02-11 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-02-11 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2014-02-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, in concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |