ME LD121 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Require Photographic Identification to Vote

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Require Photographic Identification to Vote

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #99 (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #49 (Y: 76 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2017-04-27SenateSubsequently, The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
2017-04-27SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 98 Yeas 10 - Nays 24 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2017-04-27SenateMotion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin to ACCEPT The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-51) Report In NON-CONCURRENCE FAILED
2017-04-27SenateReports READ
2017-04-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-25HouseROLL CALL NO. 49 (Yeas 76 - Nays 67 - Absent 7 - Excused 1)
2017-04-25HouseOn motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-04-25HouseReports READ.
2017-01-19SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2017-01-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-17HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2017-01-17HouseCommittee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback