ME LD1209 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 93 Yeas 32 - Nays 3 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 93 Yeas 32 - Nays 3 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Legislative Hearings on Citizen-initiated Legislation
Title
An Act To Require Legislative Hearings on Citizen-initiated Legislation
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Bradstreet [R] | Rep. Amy Arata [R] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Rep. Dennis Keschl [R] |
Rep. Lawrence Lockman [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] | Rep. William Tuell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Enactment RC #93 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 93 Yeas 32 - Nays 3 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-204), in concurrence. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-204) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-204). |
2019-05-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2019-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |