ME LD120 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Committee Structure of the State Workforce Board
Title
An Act Regarding the Committee Structure of the State Workforce Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-03-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2023-03-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-03-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2023-03-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2023-02-14 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2023-02-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-01-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |