ME LD1192 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Municipal Access to Utility Poles Located in Municipal Rights-of-way
Title
An Act To Establish Municipal Access to Utility Poles Located in Municipal Rights-of-way
Sponsors
Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Sen. Dana Dow [R] |
Rep. Allison Hepler [D] | Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. Deane Rykerson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #64 (Y: 86 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-69). |
2019-05-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-69) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-02 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 64 (Yeas 86 - Nays 56 - Absent 7 - Excused 1 - Vacancy 1) |
2019-05-02 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-69) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-69) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-04-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-04-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-03-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |