ME LD1188 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Facilitate MaineCare-Funded Assisted Living by Providing a Cost-of-living Adjustment to Private Nonmedical Institutions and Adult Family Care Homes
Title
An Act To Facilitate MaineCare-Funded Assisted Living by Providing a Cost-of-living Adjustment to Private Nonmedical Institutions and Adult Family Care Homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #221 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #208 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-31 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #184 (Y: 66 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #208 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-31 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #184 (Y: 66 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-330) in concurrence |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-330) was ADOPTED |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 221 Yeas 31 - Nays 0 - Excused 3 - Absent 1 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator RECONSIDER Acceptance of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended was ACCEPTED |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-330) |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-330) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-330) in concurrence |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-330) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-01 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 208 Yeas 12 - Nays 22 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. FAILED |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-330). |
2017-05-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-330) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-31 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 184 (Yeas 66 - Nays 74 - Absent 10 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-31 | House | Motion of Representative HYMANSON of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2017-05-31 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |