ME LD1182 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Make Revisions to the Tax Increment Financing and Development District Laws
Title
An Act to Make Revisions to the Tax Increment Financing and Development District Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2023-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2023-04-25 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2023-04-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2023-03-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |