ME LD1182 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Young Children from Sex Offenses
Title
An Act To Protect Young Children from Sex Offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | |
2011-06-15 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-15 | (H) The House INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2011-06-15 | (S) On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To acceptance of minority ought to pass as amended by committee amendment "a" (s-295) report and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-295) Ordered sent forthwith | |
2011-06-14 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) On motion of Representative PLUMMER of Windham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-06-14 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-06-13 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-295) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-06-13 | (S) 26 Yeas - 8 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent READ and ADOPTED Under suspension of the Rules | |
2011-06-13 | (S) (Remarks Made) On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 239 | |
2011-06-13 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-295) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-06-13 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-06-13 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-295) Report ACCEPTED. | |
2011-06-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York Tabled Later Today Assigned pending Motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin to accept the minority ought to pass as amended by committee amendment "a" (s-295) report Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-22 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-03-22 | (S) On motion by Senator Mason of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY | |
2011-03-22 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1182&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0357&item=1&snum=125 |