ME LD118 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require All Moped Riders under 18 Years of Age and Newly Licensed Moped Operators To Wear a Helmet
Title
An Act To Require All Moped Riders under 18 Years of Age and Newly Licensed Moped Operators To Wear a Helmet
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-36), in concurrence. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-36) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-36). |
2017-04-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-01-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2017-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2017-01-17 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |