ME LD1175 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Provide for the Review and Uniform Application of All Transmission and Distribution Utility Rates
Title
An Act to Provide for the Review and Uniform Application of All Transmission and Distribution Utility Rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-04-28 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-04-26 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-04-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2023-03-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1175&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0747&item=1&snum=131 |