ME LD1175 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand Options for the Prevention of Domestic Violence
Title
An Act To Expand Options for the Prevention of Domestic Violence
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Dion [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Sen. Dawn Hill [D] |
Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] | Sen. Heather Sanborn [D] | Rep. John Spear [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-16 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #325 (Y: 68 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-16 | House | In concurrence. |
2017-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 325 (Yeas 68 - Nays 81 - Absent 2 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-16 | House | Motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. |
2017-06-16 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |